MA H3575 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to further regulating child passenger restraints in motor vehicles. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To enhance child passenger safety

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2020-02-27HouseRules suspended
2020-02-27HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2020-02-24HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2019-10-16JointHearing rescheduled to 10/22/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1
2019-10-15JointHearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

H359 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
S24 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - New draft substituted, see S2294
H2993 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3007 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2118 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H3270 (Similar To) 2019-10-29 - Hearing scheduled for 11/05/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H1529 (Similar To) 2019-09-17 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
H3138 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3137 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2294 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback