MA H3583 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Mr. Driscoll of Milton, a petition of William J. Driscoll, Jr. and others that the Massachusetts Department of Transportation be authorized to mark state-owned trails that intersect state-owned roads with marked crosswalks and pedestrian crossing signs with flashing lights and reflectors from trailhead to trailhead. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To enhance trail crossing safety of state roads

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24HouseOught NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
2020-01-10JointHearing scheduled for 01/17/2020 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

S1376 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Motion to lay on the table pending and postponed to the next session
S2078 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2559
H3614 (Similar To) 2019-10-16 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/22/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback