MA H3661 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 66-18)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the reduction of certain toxic chemicals in firefighter personal protective equipment. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the reduction of certain toxic chemicals in firefighter personal protective equipment

Sponsors

Rep. James Hawkins [D]Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]Rep. Timothy Whelan [R]Rep. David Linsky [D]
Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. David Robertson [D]Rep. James Arciero [D]
Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Rep. Bruce Ayers [D]Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. Fred Barrows [R]
Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]Rep. David Biele [D]Sen. Michael Brady [D]Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]
Rep. Peter Capano [D]Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D]Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]Sen. Joanne Comerford [D]
Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Sen. Cynthia Creem [D]Rep. William Crocker [R]Rep. Claire Cronin [D]
Sen. Julian Cyr [D]Rep. Linda Campbell [D]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]
Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]Sen. Paul Feeney [D]Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R]Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]
Rep. Michael Finn [D]Rep. Carole Fiola [D]Rep. Denise Garlick [D]Rep. Colleen Garry [D]
Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Thomas Golden [D]Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Rep. Stephan Hay [D]
Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Kevin Honan [D]Rep. Steven Howitt [R]
Rep. Randy Hunt [R]Rep. Bradley Jones [R]Rep. Louis Kafka [D]Rep. Hannah Kane [R]
Rep. Patrick Kearney [D]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]
Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D]Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]
Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]Rep. Rady Mom [D]Rep. Mathew Muratore [R]Rep. James Murphy [D]
Rep. Brian Murray [D]Rep. Harold Naughton [D]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]Rep. Shaunna O'Connell [R]
Rep. Elizabeth Poirier [R]Rep. Denise Provost [D]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]
Rep. Michael Soter [R]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. William Straus [D]Rep. Alyson Sullivan [R]
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R]Sen. Walter Timilty [D]Sen. Dean Tran [R]Rep. Paul Tucker [D]
Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Aaron Vega [D]Rep. John Velis [D]Rep. David Vieira [R]
Rep. Roselee Vincent [D]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [R]Rep. Donald Wong [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2020-02-27HouseRules suspended
2020-02-27HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2020-02-24HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2019-09-16JointHearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

H248 (Similar To) 2019-06-28 - Hearing scheduled for 07/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
S519 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
S149 (Similar To) 2019-06-28 - Hearing scheduled for 07/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
S1400 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2
S464 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback