MA H3668 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5033
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5033
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5033
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to residential solicitation by certain non-utility competitive suppliers of energy. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
To reduce residential solicitation
Sponsors
Rep. Maria Robinson [D] | Sen. Joanne Comerford [D] | Rep. Nika Elugardo [D] | Rep. Russell Holmes [D] |
Rep. Jack Lewis [D] | Rep. David Robertson [D] | Rep. Angelo Scaccia [D] | Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-08 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5033 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 4, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-01-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/14/2020 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H347 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H1413 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S140 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4299
H3029 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S1658 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S192 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
H4209 (Similar To) 2021-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 283 of the Acts of 2020
H5033 (Replaced by) 2020-10-08 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1413 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S140 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4299
H3029 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S1658 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S192 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
H4209 (Similar To) 2021-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 283 of the Acts of 2020
H5033 (Replaced by) 2020-10-08 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3668 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3668.pdf |