MA H3700 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5103
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to recognizing the flag of the Vietnamese National Army as the official flag of the Vietnamese American community in the Commonwealth. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to recognizing the flag of the Vietnamese National Army as the official flag of the Vietnamese American community in Massachusetts
Sponsors
Rep. David LeBoeuf [D] | Rep. Tram Nguyen [D] | Sen. Nick Collins [D] | Rep. Mindy Domb [D] |
Rep. Daniel Hunt [D] | Sen. Liz Miranda [D] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5103 |
2019-05-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S1921 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H5103 (Replaced by) 2020-11-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H5103 (Replaced by) 2020-11-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3700 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3700.pdf |