MA H372 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4559
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4559
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4559
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to sports wagering. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
Relative to sports wagering
Sponsors
Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Bud Williams [D] | Rep. Jose Tosado [D] | Rep. Brian Ashe [D] |
Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D] | Rep. Nicholas Boldyga [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4559 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday February 28, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-05-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-05-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/29/2019 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
H366 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4559
H373 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4559
H68 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4559
H13 (Similar To) 2020-06-01 - House concurred
S224 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4559
H4559 (Replaced by) 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H373 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4559
H68 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4559
H13 (Similar To) 2020-06-01 - House concurred
S224 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4559
H4559 (Replaced by) 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H372 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H372.pdf |