MA H3757 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to school operational efficiency. Education.
Title
Relative to school operational efficiency
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-12-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-12-28 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2020-04-09 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday March 5, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-07-01 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 07/02/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-06-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/02/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-05-13 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H421 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S330 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S253 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S261 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H3853 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
S1113 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2711
S306 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S307 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S1582 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S2398 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S330 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S253 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S261 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H3853 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
S1113 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2711
S306 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S307 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S1582 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S2398 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3757 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3757.pdf |