MA H3770 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5148
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5148
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5148
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require criminal record checks for officials, referees or umpires officiating at certain athletic events. The Judiciary.
Title
Requiring criminal record checks for game officials
Sponsors
Rep. Carole Fiola [D] | Rep. Brian Ashe [D] | Rep. Stephan Hay [D] | Rep. Louis Kafka [D] |
Rep. Paul Schmid [D] | Rep. Alan Silvia [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5148 |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-08-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday November 12, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-05-11 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday July 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday May 12, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-10-03 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/08/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-10-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-05-13 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H5148 (Replaced by) 2020-11-25 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3770 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3770.pdf |