MA H3806 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5160
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to access to affordable dental care. Financial Services.
Title
To provide equal and fair access to affordable dental care for all patients
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5160 |
2019-10-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-05-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H602 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H1906 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3933
S667 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1137 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1267 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2296 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H5160 (Replaced by) 2020-12-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1906 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3933
S667 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1137 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1267 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2296 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H5160 (Replaced by) 2020-12-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3806 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3806.pdf |