MA H3814 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the construction of improvements to Arsenal Park in the town of Watertown. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Providing for the construction of improvements to Arsenal Park in the town of Watertown
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-25 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2019-06-17 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2019-06-06 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-06-06 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-06-06 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-06-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-05-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/04/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-05-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S1902 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S79 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2827 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1364 (Similar To) 2020-01-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2320 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S1885 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2372 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4241 (Similar To) 2020-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 48 of the Acts of 2020
S79 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2827 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1364 (Similar To) 2020-01-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2320 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S1885 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2372 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4241 (Similar To) 2020-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 48 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3814 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3814.pdf |