MA H3840 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4449

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to licensure for specialty practice pharmacies. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to specialty pharmacies

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4449
2019-12-02JointHearing scheduled for 12/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-11-07JointHearing scheduled for 11/19/2019 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
2019-10-17JointHearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 222
2019-08-28JointHearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
2019-06-06SenateSenate concurred
2019-06-05HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S582 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H3829 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Hearing scheduled for 01/27/2020 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H4449 (Replaced by) 2020-03-16 - Reported, in part, by H1886

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback