MA H3841 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on May 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to medical abortion or medication abortion at health centers at public institutions of higher education. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To require public universities to provide medication abortion

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-30SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-29HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-30HouseReported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2020-02-06SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-03HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday April 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-08-28JointHearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
2019-05-30SenateSenate concurred
2019-05-30HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H1211 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Reporting date extended to Friday November 20, 2020, pending concurrence
S2183 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
H4075 (Similar To) 2019-10-02 - New draft substituted, see H4099
H4099 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 113 of the Acts of 2019

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback