MA H3879 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4974
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4974
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4974
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to expanding the definition of affordable housing to include manufactured homes. Housing.
Title
Expanding the definition of affordable housing to include manufactured homes
Sponsors
Rep. David DeCoste [R] | Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R] | Rep. Susan Gifford [R] | Rep. Randy Hunt [R] |
Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] | Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-28 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4974 |
2019-12-02 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 12/03/2019 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-11-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/03/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-06-13 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H3696 (Similar To) 2020-04-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 55 of the Acts of 2020
H1263 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
S804 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2526
H1273 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4974
S2389 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2528
S2421 (Similar To) 2020-07-24 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H4974 (Replaced by) 2020-09-28 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1263 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
S804 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2526
H1273 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4974
S2389 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2528
S2421 (Similar To) 2020-07-24 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H4974 (Replaced by) 2020-09-28 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3879 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3879.pdf |