MA H3888 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5040
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to taxation. Revenue.
Title
Implementing progressive options for raising new revenue
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-15 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5040 |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday June 16, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday April 10, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday March 16, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-10-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-06-13 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1928 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1865 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S1725 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied H2512
H2598 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied H2512
S702 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H3953 (Similar To) 2020-10-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 193 of the Acts of 2020
H5040 (Replaced by) 2020-10-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1865 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S1725 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied H2512
H2598 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied H2512
S702 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H3953 (Similar To) 2020-10-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 193 of the Acts of 2020
H5040 (Replaced by) 2020-10-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3888 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3888.pdf |