MA H389 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the Massachusetts Gaming Commission to issue limited slot machine licenses to veterans’ organizations. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
Relative to the use of slot machines in veterans’ organizations for its members and invited guests
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-15 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-06-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 15, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday February 28, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-07-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/15/2019 from 01:30 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
H380 (Similar To) 2020-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5011
H13 (Similar To) 2020-06-01 - House concurred
H2398 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2508 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H4070 (Similar To) 2020-10-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5032
H13 (Similar To) 2020-06-01 - House concurred
H2398 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2508 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H4070 (Similar To) 2020-10-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5032
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H389 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H389.pdf |