MA H394 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5011
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a commission related to opportunity zones in the Commonwealth. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
To establish a commission related to opportunity zones in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-13 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5011 |
2019-10-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/05/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in 222 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
H2018 (Similar To) 2020-04-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1837 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H2142 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
H5011 (Replaced by) 2020-10-13 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1837 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H2142 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
H5011 (Replaced by) 2020-10-13 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H394 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H394.pdf |