MA H4016 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4000
Note: Legislation replaced by H4014

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 50 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Section 14 contained in the engrossed Bill making appropriations for the fiscal year 2020 (see House, No. 4000), which had been returned by His Excellency the Governor with recommendation of amendment (for message, see Attachment B of House, No. 4014). July 31, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to grants from the Massachusetts Tourism Trust Fund

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2019-07-31 - Senate - Senate re-Enacted Roll Call #91 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-01 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 50 of the Acts of 2019
2019-07-31SenateAgain laid before the Governor
2019-07-31SenateRe-enacted -see Roll Call #91 (Yeas 39 to Nays 0)
2019-07-31HouseRe-enacted
2019-07-31SenateEmergency preamble adopted
2019-07-31HouseEmergency preamble adopted
2019-07-31SenateGovernors amendment adopted
2019-07-31SenateRules suspended
2019-07-31HouseGovernors amendment adopted
2019-07-31HouseBills in the Third Reading special report accepted
2019-07-31HouseReferred to the committee on House Bills in the Third Reading
2019-07-31HouseFor message, see H4014, Attachment B
2019-07-31 Governor returned to the House with recommendation of amendment
2019-07-31HouseEnacted as section 14 of the General Appropriation Bill, see H4000

Same As/Similar To

H4000 (Replaced by) 2019-09-26 - Item 8900-0001 passed over veto - see Roll Call #96 [YEAS 33 - NAYS 6]
H4014 (Replaced by) 2019-07-31 - See H4000
H4019 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 48 of the Acts of 2019
H4020 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 49 of the Acts of 2019
H3898 (Similar To) 2019-07-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 31 of the Acts of 2019
H4021 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 84 of the Acts of 2019
H4017 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 82 of the Acts of 2019
H4018 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 83 of the Acts of 2019
H4252 (Similar To) 2019-12-16 - See H4246

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback