MA H402 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to encourage strategies to develop school students’ social-emotional learning competencies. Education.
Title
To promote social-emotional learning
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-08-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/04/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H402 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H402.pdf |