MA H4075 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Replaces legislation S761
Note: Legislation replaced by H4099

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - New draft substituted, see H4099
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To support improved financial stability in higher education

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To support improved financial stability in higher education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-02HouseNew draft substituted, see H4099
2019-10-02HouseRead second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means)
2019-10-02HouseRules suspended
2019-10-02HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending
2019-10-02HouseReferred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending
2019-10-02HouseCommittee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H4099
2019-09-18HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2019-09-18HouseNew draft of S761, S2183, H8 and H1217
2019-09-18HouseReported from the committee on Higher Education

Same As/Similar To

S761 (Replaces) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
H1211 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Reporting date extended to Friday November 20, 2020, pending concurrence
H1217 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
S2183 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
S1023 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H4099 (Replaced by) 2019-11-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 113 of the Acts of 2019

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback