MA H408 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5159
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-5)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to requiring head injury athletic trainers at high schools offering interscholastic athletic activities. Education.
Title
Relative to student safety in interscholastic athletic activities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-03 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5159 |
2019-05-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/31/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H1876 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4639
H1100 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1905 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5090
S1338 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
S329 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S562 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H5159 (Replaced by) 2020-12-03 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1100 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1905 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5090
S1338 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
S329 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S562 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H5159 (Replaced by) 2020-12-03 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H408 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H408.pdf |