MA H4082 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on November 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 111 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

That the city of Medford be authorized to exempt labor service positions of the department of public works, in said city, from the civil service law. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempting the labor service positions of the department of public works in the city of Medford from the civil service laws

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-13 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 111 of the Acts of 2019
2019-11-04SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2019-11-04HouseEnacted
2019-10-30SenateRead third and passed to be engrossed
2019-10-30SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2019-10-24SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2019-10-10SenateRead; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2019-10-07HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2019-10-03HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2019-10-03HouseRules suspended
2019-10-03HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2019-10-02HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2019-09-23JointHearing scheduled for 09/26/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2019-09-23SenateSenate concurred
2019-09-19HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H4042 (Similar To) 2019-12-03 - Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4079 (Similar To) 2019-10-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4053 (Similar To) 2019-12-03 - Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4054 (Similar To) 2019-12-05 - Read third and passed to be engrossed
H3026 (Similar To) 2019-10-10 - Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback