MA H4099 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H4075
Note: Replaces legislation S2392

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 113 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To support improved financial stability in higher education

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To support improved financial stability in higher education

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-06 - House - House On Enactment Yea and Nay No. 123 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - Senate - Senate Engrossed Roll Call #121 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-10-02 - House - House On Engrossment Yea and Nay No. 108 (Y: 153 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-14 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 113 of the Acts of 2019
2019-11-06SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2019-11-06HouseEnacted - 158 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 123)
2019-11-06SenateEmergency preamble adopted
2019-11-06HouseEmergency preamble adopted
2019-11-06HouseHouse concurred in the Senate amendment
2019-11-06HouseReferred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
2019-10-30SenatePassed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #121 (Yeas 37 - Nays 0)
2019-10-30SenateReprinted as amended, see S2392
2019-10-30SenateRead third
2019-10-30SenateOrdered to a third reading
2019-10-30SenateAmended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2387
2019-10-30SenateRead second
2019-10-28SenatePlaced in the Orders of the Day for Wednesday, October 30, 2019
2019-10-28SenateOrder relative to subject matter adopted
2019-10-28SenateCommittee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S2387
2019-10-07SenateRead; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2019-10-02HousePassed to be engrossed - 153 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 108)
2019-10-02HouseAmendment 3 adopted
2019-10-02HouseRead third
2019-10-02HouseRules suspended
2019-10-02HouseOrdered to a third reading
2019-10-02HouseNew draft of H4075
2019-10-02HousePending new draft of H4075
2019-10-02HouseReported from the committee on House Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

H4075 (Replaces) 2019-10-02 - New draft substituted, see H4099
H1211 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Reporting date extended to Friday November 20, 2020, pending concurrence
H1217 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
S2183 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
S2392 (Replaces) 2019-10-30 - see H4099

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback