MA H410 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 105-4)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to sexual health education in public schools. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to healthy youth

Sponsors

Rep. Paul Brodeur [D]Rep. James O'Day [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]
Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Louis Kafka [D]Rep. William Driscoll [D]Rep. Michael Moran [D]
Rep. James Arciero [D]Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. John Barrett [D]
Sen. Michael Barrett [D]Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]Rep. David Biele [D]Rep. Natalie Blais [D]
Sen. Joseph Boncore [D]Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]Rep. Peter Capano [D]Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D]
Sen. Harriette Chandler [D]Sen. Sonia Chang-Diaz [D]Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]
Sen. Brendan Crighton [D]Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]Rep. Josh Cutler [D]Sen. Julian Cyr [D]
Rep. Michael Day [D]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]
Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]
Sen. James Eldridge [D]Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]Sen. Paul Feeney [D]
Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]Rep. Ann-Margaret Ferrante [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Denise Garlick [D]
Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]
Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D]Rep. Patricia Haddad [D]Rep. Richard Haggerty [D]Rep. James Hawkins [D]
Rep. Stephan Hay [D]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. Christopher Hendricks [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]
Rep. Kate Hogan [D]Rep. Russell Holmes [D]Rep. Kevin Honan [D]Rep. Daniel Hunt [D]
Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]Rep. Patrick Kearney [D]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. James Kelcourse [R]
Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. Kathleen LaNatra [D]Rep. John Lawn [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]
Sen. Jason Lewis [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]
Rep. John Mahoney [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D]
Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]Rep. Joan Meschino [D]Rep. Aaron Michlewitz [D]Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]
Rep. Liz Miranda [D]Sen. Michael Moore [D]Rep. Harold Naughton [D]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]
Rep. Sarah Peake [D]Rep. Alice Peisch [D]Rep. William Pignatelli [D]Rep. Denise Provost [D]
Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]Rep. Maria Robinson [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D]
Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D]Rep. Jon Santiago [D]Rep. Paul Schmid [D]
Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Rep. Paul Tucker [D]Rep. Chynah Tyler [D]
Rep. Andres Vargas [D]Rep. Aaron Vega [D]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. Thomas Walsh [D]
Rep. Timothy Whelan [R]Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [R]Rep. Bud Williams [D]Rep. Donald Wong [R]
Rep. Jonathan Zlotnik [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-22HouseReporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-04-30SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-29HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-23HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-20HouseReported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2020-02-20HouseAccompanied by H427, H484, H503 and H571
2019-05-24JointHearing scheduled for 06/03/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

H557 (Similar To) 2019-06-28 - Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-2
H524 (Similar To) 2019-05-21 - Hearing scheduled for 05/31/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H566 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4433
H587 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 222
H425 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Hearing rescheduled to 07/02/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2
H545 (Similar To) 2019-05-24 - Hearing scheduled for 06/03/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
S272 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H3871 (Similar To) 2019-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
H427 (Replaces) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied H410
H484 (Replaces) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied H410
H503 (Replaces) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied H410
H571 (Replaces) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied H410

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback