MA H4112 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to energy efficiency and demand reduction resources for electric and natural gas resource needs. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to energy efficiency
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2020-01-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/22/2020 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-10-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-09-18 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
2019-07-30 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S1828 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1977 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H2820 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S1985 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1873 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4248 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4435
H4261 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S1977 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H2820 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S1985 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1873 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4248 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4435
H4261 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4112 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4112.pdf |