MA H4116 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on August 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-05 - Referred to the committee on House Bills in the Third Reading
Pending: House Bills in the Third Reading Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on August 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-05 - Referred to the committee on House Bills in the Third Reading
Pending: House Bills in the Third Reading Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Yarmouth be authorized to establish a beach capital improvement fund. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
To establish a beach capital improvement fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-05 | House | Referred to the committee on House Bills in the Third Reading |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-08-20 | House | Read third (title changed), amended and passed to be engrossed |
2019-11-04 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-04 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-11-04 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-10-30 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-10-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-10-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-10-07 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H896 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3948
H3680 (Similar To) 2020-01-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 11 of the Acts of 2020
H3948 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 88 of the Acts of 2019
H3680 (Similar To) 2020-01-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 11 of the Acts of 2020
H3948 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 88 of the Acts of 2019
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4116 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4116.pdf |