MA H4122 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5043
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-8)
Status: Introduced on September 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to motor vehicle owners’ and independent repair facilities’ access to vehicle on-board diagnostic systems. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
To enhance, update and protect the 2013 Motor Vehicle Right to Repair Law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5043 |
2020-01-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/13/2020 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-10-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-09-18 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
2019-09-03 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H359 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H3138 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3137 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H2993 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3007 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H5043 (Replaced by) 2020-10-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H3138 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3137 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H2993 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3007 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H5043 (Replaced by) 2020-10-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4122 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4122.pdf |