MA H4171 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1658
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on November 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to increasing wages of private sector human service workers
Title
Relative to increasing wages of private sector human service workers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-11-06 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2019-11-06 | House | New draft of H1658 |
2019-11-06 | House | Reported from the committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H1658 (Replaces) 2019-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4171
H1599 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1618 (Similar To) 2019-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4170
H1671 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
H1695 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
S2429 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2428 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1599 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1618 (Similar To) 2019-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4170
H1671 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
H1695 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
S2429 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2428 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4171 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4171.pdf |