MA H4230 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on November 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for the care and transportation of police dogs injured in the line of duty
Title
Providing for the care and transportation of police dogs injured in the line of duty
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-11-26 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2019-11-26 | House | New draft of H2037 |
2019-11-26 | House | Reported from the committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H2037 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4230
S2423 (Similar To) 2019-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1569 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1570 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1571 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S2423 (Similar To) 2019-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1569 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1570 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1571 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4230 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4230.pdf |