MA H4251 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 70 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 70 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Karyn Buckley, an employee of the Trial Court. The Judiciary.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Karyn Buckley, an employee of the Trial Court of the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 70 of the Acts of 2020 |
2020-04-17 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2020-04-17 | House | Enacted |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2020-04-15 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2020-04-13 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2020-04-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2020-04-06 | Senate | Read third (title changed), amended and passed to be engrossed |
2020-04-06 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-01-27 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2019-12-23 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-12-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-12-23 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-12-19 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-12-05 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
2019-11-26 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4237 (Similar To) 2020-01-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2020
H3693 (Similar To) 2019-07-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 39 of the Acts of 2019
H3744 (Similar To) 2019-06-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 25 of the Acts of 2019
H3970 (Similar To) 2019-09-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2019
H3975 (Similar To) 2019-12-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 146 of the Acts of 2019
H3693 (Similar To) 2019-07-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 39 of the Acts of 2019
H3744 (Similar To) 2019-06-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 25 of the Acts of 2019
H3970 (Similar To) 2019-09-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2019
H3975 (Similar To) 2019-12-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 146 of the Acts of 2019
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4251 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4251.pdf |