MA H4313 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4801
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4801
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4801
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the collective bargaining rights of certain administrative employees. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
To protect the collective bargaining rights of certain administrative employees
Sponsors
Rep. David Biele [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4801 |
2020-04-27 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-30 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 5, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-01-30 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday April 6, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-01-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/27/2020 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-09-09 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4801 (Replaced by) 2020-06-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4313 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4313.pdf |