MA H4354 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-05 - Accompanied H5243
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-05 - Accompanied H5243
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making appropriations for fiscal year 2020 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects
Title
Making appropriations for fiscal year 2020 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-05 | House | Accompanied H5243 |
2021-01-05 | House | Reported, in part, by H5243 |
2020-06-29 | House | Reported, in part, by H4817 |
2020-06-02 | House | Reported, in part, by H4767 |
2020-04-23 | House | Reported, in part, by H4672 |
2020-03-12 | House | Reported, in part, by H4561 |
2020-02-26 | House | Reported, in part, by H4502 |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported, in part, by H4367 |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H4367 (Replaced by) 2020-02-05 - Published as amended, see H4398
H4817 (Replaced by) 2020-06-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 106 of the Acts of 2020
H5243 (Replaced by) 2021-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 350 of the Acts of 2020
H4817 (Replaced by) 2020-06-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 106 of the Acts of 2020
H5243 (Replaced by) 2021-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 350 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4354 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4354.pdf |