MA H4447 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1943
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a special commission to study the integration of support groups into our healthcare system
Title
Establishing a special commission to study the integration of support groups into our healthcare system
Sponsors
House Joint Committee on Public Health | Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Rep. Denise Garlick [D] |
Rep. Thomas Stanley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-26 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2020-02-26 | House | New draft of H1943 |
2020-02-26 | House | Reported from the committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H1943 (Replaces) 2020-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4447
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4447 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4447.pdf |