MA H4448 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H1949
Note: Legislation replaced by H4818

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 63-3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - New draft substituted, see H4818
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To reduce racial disparities in maternal health

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To reduce racial disparities in maternal health

Sponsors

House Joint Committee on Public Health CommitteeRep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. Liz Miranda [D]Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]
Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]Rep. David Biele [D]
Rep. Natalie Blais [D]Rep. Peter Capano [D]Rep. Tackey Chan [D]Sen. Harriette Chandler [D]
Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]Sen. Julian Cyr [D]Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]
Rep. Mindy Domb [D]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Rep. William Driscoll [D]Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]
Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R]
Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Denise Garlick [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]
Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Rep. Richard Haggerty [D]Rep. James Hawkins [D]
Rep. Stephan Hay [D]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Kate Hogan [D]
Rep. Kevin Honan [D]Rep. Daniel Hunt [D]Rep. Hannah Kane [R]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]
Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]
Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]
Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D]Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]Rep. Rady Mom [D]Rep. Brian Murray [D]
Rep. Sarah Peake [D]Rep. Denise Provost [D]Rep. David Robertson [D]Rep. Maria Robinson [D]
Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R]Sen. Walter Timilty [D]Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]
Rep. Andres Vargas [D]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. Bud Williams [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29HouseNew draft substituted, see H4818
2020-06-29HouseRead second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means)
2020-06-29HouseRules suspended
2020-06-29HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending
2020-06-29HouseReferred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending
2020-06-29HouseCommittee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill, see H4818
2020-06-11HouseCommittee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2020-04-30SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-29HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-23HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-26HouseReported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2020-02-26HouseNew draft of H1949
2020-02-26HouseReported from the committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H1949 (Replaces) 2020-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4448
H4818 (Replaced by) 2020-07-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback