MA H445 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5025
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5025
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5025
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to vocational education transportation for nonresident students. Education.
Title
Relative to vocational education transportation for nonresident students
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-08 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5025 |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-06-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 15, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 5, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday March 5, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-06-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/24/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S289 (Similar To) 2020-08-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2887
S1971 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 30 of the Acts of 2020
H5025 (Replaced by) 2020-10-08 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1971 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 30 of the Acts of 2020
H5025 (Replaced by) 2020-10-08 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H445 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H445.pdf |