MA H4512 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-3)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-19 - House concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-19 - House concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the federal Open Burn Pit Registry and exposure of veterans and service members to certain airborne hazards. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Relative to the Airborne Hazards and Open Burn Pit Registry
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-19 | House | House concurred |
2020-10-13 | Senate | Amendment (changing reporting date to Thursday December 31, 2020) adopted, pending concurrence |
2020-10-13 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday October 15, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-06-15 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday October 15, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 15, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/11/2020 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-06 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4512 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4512.pdf |