MA H4586 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4525
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on November 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 310 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on November 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 310 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the city of Beverly to grant additional licenses for the sale of alcoholic beverages
Title
Authorizing the city of Beverly to grant additional licenses for the sale of alcoholic beverages
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-10 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 310 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2016-11-03 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2016-11-03 | House | Enacted |
2016-10-31 | Senate | Read third and passed to engrossed |
2016-10-31 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-09-22 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-09-01 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-09-01 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-09-01 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-08-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-08-22 | House | New draft of H4525 |
2016-08-22 | House | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4525 (Replaces) 2016-08-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4586
H3368 (Similar To) 2015-07-27 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3691
H3369 (Similar To) 2015-10-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 106 of the Acts of 2015
H3370 (Similar To) 2015-06-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 43 of the Acts of 2015
H3371 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 67 of the Acts of 2016
H3372 (Similar To) 2016-02-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 33 of the Acts of 2016
H3368 (Similar To) 2015-07-27 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3691
H3369 (Similar To) 2015-10-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 106 of the Acts of 2015
H3370 (Similar To) 2015-06-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 43 of the Acts of 2015
H3371 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 67 of the Acts of 2016
H3372 (Similar To) 2016-02-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 33 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4586 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4586.pdf |