MA H4598 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2622

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 53 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To address challenges faced by municipalities and state authorities resulting from COVID-19

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To address challenges faced by municipalities and state authorities resulting from COVID-19

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-03 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 53 of the Acts of 2020
2020-04-02SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2020-04-02HouseEnacted
2020-04-02SenateEmergency preamble adopted
2020-04-02HouseEmergency preamble adopted
2020-04-02SenateSenate concurred in the still still further House amendment
2020-04-02SenateRules suspended
2020-04-02HouseHouse concurred in the Senate amendment with a still, still further amendment, striking all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of House document numbered 4617
2020-04-02HouseReferred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
2020-04-01SenateSenate concurred in the further House amendment with a still further amendment, see S2622
2020-03-30HouseHouse concurred in the Senate amendment with a further amendment, striking all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of House document numbered 4612
2020-03-30HouseReferred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
2020-03-30SenateRead third and passed to be engrossed
2020-03-30SenateOrdered to a third reading
2020-03-30SenateAmended (Rodrigues) by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2619
2020-03-30SenateRead, rules suspended, read second
2020-03-27HouseRead, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third and passed to be engrossed
2020-03-27HouseReported on a part of H4586
2020-03-27HouseReported from the committee on House Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

S2622 (Replaced by) 2020-04-01 - See H4598

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback