MA H4605 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S835
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-10 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-10 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to construction defect claims by condominium owners
Title
Relative to construction defect claims by condominium owners
Sponsors
House Joint Committee on the Judiciary | Rep. Claire Cronin [D] | Sen. Michael Brady [D] | Sen. Julian Cyr [D] |
Rep. Michelle DuBois [D] | Sen. Michael Barrett [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-10 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2020-07-16 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2020-07-15 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-24 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2020-02-06 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-02-06 | House | New draft of S835 and H3260 |
2020-02-06 | House | Reported from the committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S835 (Replaces) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4605 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4605.pdf |