MA H4616 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H4586

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 56 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To further address challenges faced by municipalities, school districts and state authorities resulting from COVID-19

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To further address challenges faced by municipalities, school districts and state authorities resulting from COVID-19

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-10SenateSigned by the Governor, Chapter 56 of the Acts of 2020
2020-04-09SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2020-04-09HouseEnacted
2020-04-09SenateEmergency preamble adopted
2020-04-09HouseEmergency preamble adopted
2020-04-09HouseHouse concurred in the Senate amendment
2020-04-09HouseReferred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
2020-04-09SenateRead third and passed to be engrossed
2020-04-09SenateOrdered to a third reading
2020-04-09SenateAmended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2629
2020-04-09SenateRead second
2020-04-09SenateRules suspended
2020-04-09SenateCommittee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S2629
2020-04-06SenateRead; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2020-04-02HouseRead, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third and passed to be engrossed
2020-04-02HouseReported on the residue of H4586
2020-04-02HouseReported from the committee on House Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

H4586 (Replaces) 2020-04-02 - Reported on the residue by H4616

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback