MA H4627 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 72-7)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to providing certain state employees sick leave for COVID-19 related absences. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing certain state employees sick leave for COVID-19 related absences

Sponsors

Rep. James O'Day [D]Sen. Paul Feeney [D]Rep. James Arciero [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]
Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. David Biele [D]Rep. Natalie Blais [D]
Sen. Michael Brady [D]Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]Rep. Linda Campbell [D]Rep. Peter Capano [D]
Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D]Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Rep. William Crocker [R]
Rep. Claire Cronin [D]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. Marcos Devers [D]Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]
Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]
Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]Rep. Carole Fiola [D]Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R]
Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Colleen Garry [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]
Rep. Patricia Haddad [D]Rep. Stephan Hay [D]Rep. James Hawkins [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]
Sen. Adam Hinds [D]Rep. Steven Howitt [R]Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]Rep. Hannah Kane [R]
Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]
Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. Joan Meschino [D]Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]
Sen. Michael Moore [D]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]Sen. Marc Pacheco [D]Rep. Denise Provost [D]
Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]Rep. David Robertson [D]Rep. Maria Robinson [D]Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D]
Rep. Jon Santiago [D]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. Alyson Sullivan [R]Sen. Walter Timilty [D]
Rep. Chynah Tyler [D]Rep. Andres Vargas [D]Rep. Aaron Vega [D]Sen. John Velis [D]
Rep. Roselee Vincent [D]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. Timothy Whelan [R]Rep. Tackey Chan [D]
Rep. Fred Barrows [R]Rep. Kathleen LaNatra [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]Rep. Christopher Hendricks [D]
Sen. Sonia Chang-Diaz [D]Rep. Harold Naughton [D]Rep. Kevin Honan [D]Rep. Jose Tosado [D]
Sen. Barry Finegold [D]Sen. Anne Gobi [D]Rep. Brian Murray [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2020-06-04SenateSenate concurred
2020-05-04HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-04-16JointHearing scheduled for 04/21/2020 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Electronic Hearing
2020-04-06SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-30HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service
2020-03-26HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback