MA H4659 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-30 - Reporting date extended to Friday July 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-30 - Reporting date extended to Friday July 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Roy of Franklin, a petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of Jeffrey N. Roy and others that certain institutions of higher education offering emergency aid be immune from suit and liability. The Judiciary.
Title
To protect institutions that provide emergency aid in response to the outbreak of the 2019 novel coronavirus, also known as COVID-19
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday July 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-05-11 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday June 30, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/05/2020 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-09 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
2020-04-06 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4659 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4659.pdf |