MA H4660 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4559
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on November 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 292 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on November 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 292 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to a real property exemption for disabled persons in the Town of Westford
Title
Relative to a real property exemption for disabled persons in the Town of Westford
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-08 | Senate | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 292 of the Acts of 2018 |
2018-11-01 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-11-01 | House | Enacted |
2018-10-29 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-10-29 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-09-13 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-09-10 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-07-03 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-07-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-07-03 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-06-27 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-06-27 | House | New draft of H4559 |
2018-06-27 | House | Reported from the committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4559 (Replaces) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4660
S76 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H113 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S288 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H334 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H4978 (Similar To) 2018-12-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4998
S76 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H113 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S288 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H334 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H4978 (Similar To) 2018-12-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4998
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4660 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4660.pdf |