MA H4683 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-31 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4923
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-31 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4923
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Gouveia of Acton and Senator Eldridge, a joint petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of Tami L. Gouveia and James B. Eldridge that the Water Supply District of Acton be authorized to enter into a lease, license or other disposition of land held for water supply purposes for the construction, operation and maintenance of a solar energy generating and energy storage facility. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Authorizing the Water Supply District of Acton to enter into a lease, license or other disposition of land held for water supply purposes for the construction, operation and maintenance of a solar energy generating and energy storage facility
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-31 | House | Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4923 |
2020-07-31 | House | Read third |
2020-06-08 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-06-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-06-08 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2020-05-26 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-15 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
2020-03-05 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4683 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4683.pdf |