MA H4704 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 121 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 121 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substituted, on motion of Mr. Speliotis of Danvers, for a Bill amending the charter of the town of Dedham (House, No. 4080). May 11, 2020.
Title
Changing the name of the board of selectmen in the town of Dedham to the select board
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 121 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2020-07-13 | House | Enacted |
2020-07-09 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-07-09 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-05-11 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2020-05-11 | House | Substituted for H4080 |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4704 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4704.pdf |