MA H4705 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 309 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 309 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Salem be authorized to appoint retired Salem police officers as special police officers in said city. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Concerning the appointment of retired Salem police officers as special police officers within the city of Salem
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Tucker [D] | Sen. Joan Lovely [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-21 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 309 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-11-21 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-11-19 | House | Enacted |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-10-11 | House | Read third (title changed), amended and passed to be engrossed |
2018-07-12 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-07-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-07-12 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-07-11 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-07-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2018 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in 437 |
2018-07-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-07-05 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1371 (Similar To) 2018-01-26 - Accompanied S1328
S1452 (Similar To) 2017-07-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 33 of the Acts of 2017
S1377 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1380 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1385 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4918 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 352 of the Acts of 2018
S1452 (Similar To) 2017-07-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 33 of the Acts of 2017
S1377 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1380 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1385 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4918 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 352 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4705 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4705.pdf |