MA H4708 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on May 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-20 - Published as amended, see H4733
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-20 - Published as amended, see H4733
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Financing the general governmental infrastructure of the Commonwealth
Title
Financing the general governmental infrastructure of the Commonwealth
Sponsors
House House Committee on Ways and Means | House Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Roll Calls
2020-05-20 - House - House On Engrossment Yea and Nay No. 173 (Y: 149 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - House - House on adoption Consolidated Amendment Yea and Nay No. 172 (Y: 138 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - House - House on adoption Consolidated Amendment Yea and Nay No. 172 (Y: 138 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-20 | House | Published as amended, see H4733 |
2020-05-20 | House | Consolidated amendment A adopted - 138 YEAS to 18 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 172) |
2020-05-20 | House | Read third |
2020-05-14 | House | Order adopted, see H4711 |
2020-05-13 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-05-13 | House | Order adopted, see H4709 |
2020-05-13 | House | New draft of H4039 |
2020-05-13 | House | Pending new draft of H4039 |
2020-05-13 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H4039 (Replaces) 2020-05-13 - New draft substituted, see H4708
H4709 (Replaced by) 2020-05-13 - Adopted, see H4708
H4711 (Replaced by) 2020-05-14 - Adopted, see H4708
H4733 (Replaced by) 2020-07-31 - Reported by H4932
H4709 (Replaced by) 2020-05-13 - Adopted, see H4708
H4711 (Replaced by) 2020-05-14 - Adopted, see H4708
H4733 (Replaced by) 2020-07-31 - Reported by H4932
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4708 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4708.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov/Journal/House/191/RollCalls/hj05202020_RollCalls.pdf |