MA H4714 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-02 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4833
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-02 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4833
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Hadley be authorized to convey a conservation restriction on certain parcels of land in said town to Kestrel Land Trust. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Hadley to convey a conservation restriction on certain parcels of land
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | House | Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4833 |
2020-07-02 | House | Read third |
2020-06-08 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-06-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-06-08 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2020-05-26 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-05-14 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4714 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4714.pdf |