MA H4718 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5141
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-2)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H5141
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H5141
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to rent freeze and rent control during the state and federal state of emergency declarations of March, 2020. Housing.
Title
Providing for a rent increase freeze in response to COVID-19
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-07 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5141 |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-08-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Saturday October 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-06-11 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday July 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-05-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/21/2020 from 09:00 AM-04:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-02 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
2020-03-30 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H5141 (Replaced by) 2020-12-07 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4718 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4718.pdf |