MA H4733 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-31 - Reported by H4932
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-31 - Reported by H4932
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House, No. 4708, as changed by the
Title
Financing the general governmental infrastructure of the Commonwealth
Sponsors
House House Committee on Ways and Means | House Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-31 | House | Reported by H4932 |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Committee of conference appointed (Rodrigues-DiDomenico-Fattman), in concurrence |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Senate insisted on its amendment |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-07-16 | House | Committee of conference appointed - (Michlewitz-Gregoire-Vieira) |
2020-07-16 | House | House NON-concurred in the Senate amendment |
2020-07-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-07-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Reprinted as amended, see S2819 |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Amendment by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2790, as amended |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Read second |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S2790 |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means, with the amendment pending |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S2759 |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Hearing scheduled for 06/04/2020 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Referred to the committee on Senate Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets |
2020-05-20 | House | Passed to be engrossed - 149 YEAS to 7 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 173) |
2020-05-20 | House | H4708, published as amended |
Same As/Similar To
H4708 (Replaces) 2020-05-20 - Published as amended, see H4733
S2819 (Replaces) 2020-07-02 - See H4733
H4932 (Replaces) 2020-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 151 of the Acts of 2020
S2819 (Replaces) 2020-07-02 - See H4733
H4932 (Replaces) 2020-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 151 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4733 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4733.pdf |