MA H4736 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4821
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4821
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4821
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to employment under the unemployment insurance program. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to employee definition harmonization
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4821 |
2020-06-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/05/2020 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-23 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
2020-04-16 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4821 (Replaced by) 2020-06-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4736 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4736.pdf |